Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues de Bar

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornLubersac
12 May 166634.3SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
7 Mar 166735.1ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
10 Apr 166735.2Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
167139.0ResignedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
28 Jan 167139.0SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
2 May 167240.3ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
22 Dec 169159.9DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues de Bar:
Bishop Hugues de Bar (died ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015