Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Étienne Cardinal Le Camus

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1632BornParis
8 Jan 167138.2SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
1 Jul 167138.7ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
24 Aug 167138.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
2 Sep 168653.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 169158.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
12 Sep 170774.9DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne Le Camus:
Étienne Cardinal Le Camus (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015