Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Armand de Rotondy de Biscarras

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹BornParis
27 Jan 166428.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 166933.2SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
5 Aug 166933.5ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
20 Oct 166933.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
1671¹35.0ResignedBishop of Lodève, France
5 Jan 167135.0SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
22 Feb 167236.1ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
15 Feb 170266.1DiedBishop of Béziers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Armand de Rotondy de Biscarras:
Bishop Jean-Armand de Rotondy de Biscarras (born 1636, died ) Bishop of Béziers

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 121, and Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015