Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Phélypeaux de La Vrillière

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹Born
25 Mar 167533.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 167533.2AppointedBishop of Uzés, France
23 Mar 167634.2ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
7 Jun 167634.4Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
18 Jun 167735.4SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
167836.0ResignedBishop of Uzés, France
10 Apr 167937.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
28 Apr 169452.3DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Phélypeaux de La Vrillière
Archbishop Michel Phélypeaux de La Vrillière (born 1642, died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122, and Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018