Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Pradel

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹BornDauphiné
18 Mar 167329.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 167531.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Montpellier, France
27 Apr 167632.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Montpellier, France
27 Apr 167632.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
24 Jun 167632.4SucceededBishop of Montpellier, France
28 Jun 167632.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
17 Sep 169652.7DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Pradel:
Bishop Charles de Pradel (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256, and Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015