Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Villeneuve de Vence

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645BornVencien
18 Apr 168641.3SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
5 Oct 169348.8ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
18 Apr 169449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
2 May 170257.3DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Villeneuve de Vence:
Bishop Charles de Villeneuve de Vence (died ) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013