Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Cosnac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Die


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornVic-Le-Comte
24 Dec 170149.9SelectedBishop of Die, France
12 Jun 170250.4ConfirmedBishop of Die, France
23 Jul 170250.5Ordained BishopBishop of Die, France
15 Apr 173482.2ResignedBishop of Die, France
26 Oct 173987.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Die, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Cosnac:
Bishop Gabriel de Cosnac (born 1652, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Die

  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015