Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Thomas d’Acquin

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1667Born
27 Mar 169729.8AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
16 Jun 169730.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
1 Nov 169831.4SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
30 Mar 169931.8ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
17 May 171042.9DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Thomas d’Acquin
Bishop Louis Thomas d’Acquin (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast