Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim-Joseph d’Estaing de Saillans

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654BornClaromontan
9 Nov 169339.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
3 Jan 169440.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
13 Apr 174288.3DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Joachim-Joseph d’Estaing de Saillans:
Bishop Joachim-Joseph d’Estaing de Saillans (died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a bishop for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013