Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François de Loménie de Brienne

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637BornParis
5 Dec 166629.9SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
12 Dec 166730.9ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
19 Feb 166831.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
7 Apr 172083.2DiedBishop of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François de Loménie de Brienne:
Bishop Charles-François de Loménie de Brienne (born 1637, died ) Bishop of Coutances

  • a bishop for 52.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015