Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Ladvocat-Billiard

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1620BornParis
1672¹51.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 167554.9SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
8 Feb 167756.8ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
30 May 167757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
11 Apr 168161.0DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Ladvocat-Billiard:
Bishop Nicolas Ladvocat-Billiard (born , died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a priest for 9.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015