Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Ignace de Baglion du Saillant, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornLyon
165824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
24 Feb 167945.1SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
12 Jun 167945.4ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
23 Jul 167945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
26 Apr 168652.3SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
23 Nov 169359.8ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
26 Jan 169864.0DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Ignace de Baglion du Saillant:
Bishop François-Ignace de Baglion du Saillant C.O. (born 1634, died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015