Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Massei

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1663BornMontepulciano
23 Dec 170239.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Apr 170340.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 172158.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
23 Mar 172158.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
24 Aug 172259.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
Sep 1730³67.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
2 Oct 173067.7Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 173168.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
21 May 173168.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
20 Nov 174582.8DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Massei (VIAF: 89071010)
Bartolomeo Cardinal Massei (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
  • a cardinal for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1730
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 82
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1721, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Nov 2016