Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc-Antoine de Noé

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1724³BornSainte-Soulle
1 Jan 176338.7SelectedBishop of Lescar, France
16 May 176339.1ConfirmedBishop of Lescar, France
12 Jun 176339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lescar, France
7 Nov 180177.5ResignedBishop of Lescar, France
11 Apr 180278.0AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
22 Sep 180278.4DiedBishop of Troyes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marc-Antoine de Noé:
Bishop Marc-Antoine de Noé (born Apr 1724, died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015