Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-Eléonore-Léon Le Clerc de Juigné

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1728BornParis
30 Mar 175425.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 176435.1SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
9 Apr 176435.4ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
29 Apr 176435.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
23 Dec 178153.1SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
21 Feb 178253.3ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
25 Feb 178253.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
31 Jan 180273.2RetiredArchbishop of Paris, France
19 Mar 181182.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Eléonore-Léon Le Clerc de Juigné:
Archbishop Antoine-Eléonore-Léon Le Clerc de Juigné (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155, and Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016