Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jérême de Suffren de Saint-Tropez

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1721BornArles
27 May 176442.8SelectedBishop of Sisteron, France
20 Aug 176443.1ConfirmedBishop of Sisteron, France
30 Sep 176443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sisteron, France
17 May 178967.8SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
3 Aug 178968.0ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
21 Jun 179674.9DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jérême de Suffren de Saint-Tropez:
Bishop Louis-Jérême de Suffren de Saint-Tropez (born , died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,020
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312, and Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015