Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-de-Dieu-Raymond Cardinal de Boisgelin de Cucè

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1732BornRennes
1755²22.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 176432.8SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
27 Mar 176533.0ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
28 Apr 176533.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
4 Nov 177038.6SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
27 Feb 177139.0ResignedBishop of Lavaur, France
17 Jun 177139.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
7 Nov 180169.6ResignedArchbishop of Aix, France
12 Apr 180270.1SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
16 Apr 180270.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
17 Jan 180370.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Aug 180472.4DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jean-de-Dieu-Raymond de Boisgelin de Cucè
Jean-de-Dieu-Raymond Cardinal de Boisgelin de Cucè (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
  • a cardinal for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 381
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 92, and Page 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016