Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbain-René de Hercé

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1726Born
19 Apr 176741.2SelectedBishop of Dol, France
15 Jun 176741.3ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
5 Jul 176741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
6 Sep 176741.5InstalledBishop of Dol, France
30 Jul 179569.4DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Urbain-René de Hercé (VIAF: 140302591)
Bishop Urbain-René de Hercé (born , died ) Bishop of Dol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayenne

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018