Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toussaint-François-Joseph Conen de Saint-Luc

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1724BornRennes
12 May 177348.8SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
12 Jul 177348.9ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
29 Aug 177349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
30 Sep 179066.2DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for Toussaint-François-Joseph Conen de Saint-Luc:
Bishop Toussaint-François-Joseph Conen de Saint-Luc (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015