Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marc de Royére

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1727BornBadefols d’Ans
2 Nov 176639.0SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
16 Feb 176739.3ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
26 Apr 176739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
27 Jul 177345.8SelectedBishop of Castres, France
11 Sep 177345.9ResignedBishop of Tréguier, France
13 Sep 177345.9ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
8 Nov 180174.1ResignedBishop of Castres, France
24 May 180274.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Castres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marc de Royére:
Bishop Jean-Marc de Royére (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castres

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154, and Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015