Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Augustin Godard de Belbœuf

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1730Born
16 Jan 177443.6SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
18 Apr 177443.9ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
15 May 177444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
26 Sep 180878.3DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Augustin Godard de Belbœuf (VIAF: 18031899)
Bishop Pierre-Augustin Godard de Belbœuf (born , died ) Bishop of Avranches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018