Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-André de Grimaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Noyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1736Born
19 Apr 176730.3SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
15 Jun 176730.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
5 Jul 176730.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
16 Oct 177740.8SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
12 Dec 177740.9ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
30 Mar 177841.2ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
28 Dec 180468.0DiedBishop of Noyon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-André de Grimaldi (VIAF: 73691615)
Bishop Louis-André de Grimaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Noyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagnes

  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018