Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Mathias-Joseph de Barral

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1746BornGrenoble
9 Mar 178841.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Troyes, France
15 Sep 178842.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Troyes, France
15 Sep 178842.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
5 Oct 178842.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
22 Dec 179044.7SucceededBishop of Troyes, France
5 Oct 180155.5ResignedBishop of Troyes, France
12 Apr 180256.0SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
14 Apr 180256.0ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
30 Jan 180558.8SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
1 Feb 180558.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
1 Sep 181569.4ResignedArchbishop of Tours, France
6 Jun 181670.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Mathias-Joseph de Barral:
Archbishop Louis-Mathias-Joseph de Barral (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 260, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013