Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-François Bienaymé

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1737Born
11 Apr 180264.4SelectedBishop of Metz, France
4 May 180264.5ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
9 May 180264.5Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
9 Feb 180668.2DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-François Bienaymé
Bishop Pierre-François Bienaymé (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontbard

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,802, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast