Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luc-Jean-Baptiste Bailly

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1763Born
30 Sep 180239.5SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
19 Oct 180239.6ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
24 Oct 180239.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
8 Apr 180441.0DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Luc-Jean-Baptiste Bailly
Bishop Luc-Jean-Baptiste Bailly (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018