Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis-Simon Rollet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1746Born
15 Oct 180256.2SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
10 Nov 180256.3ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
14 Nov 180256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
17 Jun 180659.9ResignedBishop of Montpellier, France
11 Oct 182478.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis-Simon Rollet
Bishop Jean-Louis-Simon Rollet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochefort

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018