Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Melchior de Messey

Deceased

Bishop of Valence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1748BornBiesles
3 Aug 178839.8SelectedBishop of Valence, France
15 Sep 178839.9ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
5 Oct 178840.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
17 Mar 180657.4DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Melchior de Messey
Bishop Gabriel-Melchior de Messey (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016