Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-François Cardinal de Bausset-Roquefort

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alès (Alais)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1748BornPondichéry, India
1773²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 178435.2SelectedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
25 Jun 178435.5ConfirmedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
18 Jul 178435.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
22 Sep 180152.8ResignedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
28 Jul 181768.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 182475.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Alès (Alais), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François de Bausset-Roquefort:
Cardinal Louis-François de Bausset-Roquefort (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alès (Alais)

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Jul 1817

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013