Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Cardinal de Mailly

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1658BornParis
24 Dec 169739.8SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
7 Apr 169840.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
11 May 169840.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
12 Jul 171052.4SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
1 Dec 171052.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
29 Nov 171961.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Sep 172163.5DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for François de Mailly:
Cardinal François de Mailly (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013