Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Toussaint Cardinal de Forbin de Janson

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1631BornProvence
165321.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Digne, France
5 Jul 165523.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Digne, France
5 Jul 165523.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
14 May 165624.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
14 Apr 166432.5SucceededBishop of Digne, France
27 Jan 166836.3SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
9 Jul 166836.7ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
14 Aug 167947.8SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
25 Sep 167947.9ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
13 Feb 169058.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jul 169058.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
28 Sep 169361.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
24 Mar 171381.4DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Toussaint de Forbin de Janson:
Toussaint Cardinal de Forbin de Janson (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 56.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015