Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Sleyne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹Born
27 Mar 166324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
3 Nov 169253.8SelectedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
13 Apr 169354.2ConfirmedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
18 Apr 169354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
5 Dec 169354.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ross, Ireland
22 Jan 171273.0ResignedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
16 Feb 171273.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Sleyne
Bishop John Baptist Sleyne (born 1639, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cork and Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMidleton, Co. Cork
Ordained PriestRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen, France
Ordained BishopSt. Isidore's, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Buom Successo, Convent

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 13
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Aug 2020

Quantcast