Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Malachy Dulany

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658²Born
1695²37.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 171355.7AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
18 Feb 171456.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
7 May 173173.3DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malachy Dulany
Bishop Malachy Dulany (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,489
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 39, and Page 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast