Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Michael Ellis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1652Born
30 Nov 167018.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Jan 168835.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 168835.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
16 May 168835.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
Feb 1705³52.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
3 Oct 170856.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
28 Oct 170856.1InstalledBishop of Segni, Italy
16 Nov 172674.1DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Michael Ellis (VIAF: 79252096)
Bishop Philip Michael Ellis O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaddesdon, Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopChapel Royal, St. James's Palace, Westminster, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceBishop's House, Segni, Diocese of Segni
Buried Place (Original)Seminary Chapel, Segni, Diocese of Segni

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106, and Page 357
  • bd/bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,407
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 7
  • bd: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 21 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018