Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de La Romagère de Ronssecy

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1712Born
7 Mar 175138.3SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
5 Jul 175138.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
29 Aug 175138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
18 Feb 176956.2DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de La Romagère de Ronssecy
Bishop Pierre de La Romagère de Ronssecy (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThiviers Dordogne

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018