Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Joseph de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1685BornLyon
4 Mar 172034.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carcassonne, France
4 Mar 172034.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
21 Jul 172034.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
1 Mar 172236.5SucceededBishop of Carcassonne, France
31 Dec 172944.3DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne:
Bishop Louis-Joseph de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015