Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Maboul

Deceased

Bishop of Alet, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Nov 1708AppointedBishop of Alet, France
19 Feb 1710ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
13 Jul 1710Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
21 May 1723DiedBishop of Alet, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Maboul
Bishop Jacques Maboul (died ) Bishop of Alet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast