Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-François de Bliterswyck de Montcley

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateEventTitle
1721SelectedBishop of Autun, France
20 Dec 1723ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
5 Mar 1724Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
31 Mar 1732AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
12 Nov 1734DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-François de Bliterswyck de Montcley:
Archbishop Antoine-François de Bliterswyck de Montcley (died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013