Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Charles de Béringhen d’Armainvilliers

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1692BornParis
171724.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 172532.8SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
20 Feb 172633.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
24 Mar 172633.8Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
17 Oct 174250.4DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for François-Charles de Béringhen d’Armainvilliers:
Bishop François-Charles de Béringhen d’Armainvilliers (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013