Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Caulet

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1693Born
18 Sep 171724.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 172532.6SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
20 Mar 172632.9ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
14 Apr 172633.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
27 Sep 177178.4DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Caulet (VIAF: 66520202)
Bishop Jean de Caulet (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018