Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Charles du Lau d’Allemans

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1747BornMontardy de Grand Brassac Dordogne
4 Jan 178941.5SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
30 Mar 178941.7ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
19 Apr 178941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
4 Apr 180254.7DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Charles du Lau d’Allemans
Bishop Henri-Charles du Lau d’Allemans (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016