Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. François-Joseph de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1736BornAngoulême
22 Mar 177236.0SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
22 Jun 177236.3ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
12 Jul 177236.3Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
2 Sep 179256.5DiedBishop of Beauvais, France
17 Oct 1926Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. François-Joseph de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers
Bishop Bl. François-Joseph de La Rochefoucauld-Bayers (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016