Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique de Lastic Fournels

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1742BornFournels
3 Oct 177936.9SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
13 Dec 177937.1ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
9 Jan 178037.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
3 Mar 179552.3DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

MicroData Summary for Dominique de Lastic Fournels:
Bishop Dominique de Lastic Fournels (born , died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015