Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Arnauld de Castellane

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1733Born
1 Nov 176733.8SelectedBishop of Mende, France
25 Jan 176834.1ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
14 Feb 176834.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
9 Sep 179258.7DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Arnauld de Castellane (VIAF: 62644058)
Bishop Jean-Arnauld de Castellane (born , died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont-Saint-Esprit
Death PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Louis, Cemetery, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,768, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289
  • loc: AJ, 8 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast