Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-François de Couët du Vivier de Lorry

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1727BornMetz, France
25 Dec 176337.0SelectedBishop of Vence, France
9 Apr 176437.3ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
1 May 176437.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
18 Jun 176942.4SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
11 Sep 176942.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
4 Aug 178255.6SelectedBishop of Angers, France
20 Sep 178255.7ResignedBishop of Tarbes, France
23 Sep 178255.7ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
19 Sep 180174.7ResignedBishop of Angers, France
12 Apr 180275.3SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
17 Apr 180275.3ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
20 Nov 180275.9RetiredBishop of La Rochelle, France
14 Mar 180376.2DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for Michel-François de Couët du Vivier de Lorry:
Bishop Michel-François de Couët du Vivier de Lorry (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 83, and Page 392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013