Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Joseph Cardinal de Montmorency-Laval

Deceased

Bishop of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1724BornBayers
7 Nov 175328.9SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
14 Jan 175429.0ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
10 Feb 175429.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
8 Oct 175732.8SelectedBishop of Condom, France
28 Feb 175833.2ResignedBishop of Orléans, France
13 Mar 175833.2ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
21 Aug 176035.6SelectedBishop of Metz, France
6 Apr 176136.3ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
30 Mar 178964.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jun 180883.5DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph de Montmorency-Laval:
Louis-Joseph Cardinal de Montmorency-Laval (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a bishop for 54.3 years
  • a cardinal for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 5
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016