Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Deodatus de Chaumont de Mareuil

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1708Born
27 Mar 176556.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
26 May 176556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
26 Nov 176860.0DiedTitular Bishop of Sion

MicroData Summary for Deodatus de Chaumont de Mareuil
Bishop Deodatus de Chaumont de Mareuil (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNamur

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,765, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast