Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-François de La Broue de Vareilles

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1734BornSommieres du Clain
1 Feb 178449.4SelectedBishop of Gap, France
25 Jun 178449.8ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
25 Jul 178449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
1815¹80.3ResignedBishop of Gap, France
25 Nov 183197.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Gap, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-François de La Broue de Vareilles:
Bishop Henri-François de La Broue de Vareilles (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gap

  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016