Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Simon-François d’Aigneville de Millancourt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1706Born
22 Sep 176053.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
22 Sep 176053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
23 Nov 176053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
27 Oct 179386.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Simon-François d’Aigneville de Millancourt
Bishop Albert-Simon-François d’Aigneville de Millancourt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambrai

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 81, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018