Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph de Brunes de Monlouet

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1712Born
29 Jun 175441.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
16 Sep 175441.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
12 Jan 175542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
23 Aug 176552.8DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph de Brunes de Monlouet
Bishop François-Joseph de Brunes de Monlouet (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

EventPlace
Birth PlacePleine-Fougères

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018