Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-César-Constantin Cardinal de Rohan-Guémené-Montbazon

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1697BornParis
23 Sep 175659.5SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
3 Jan 175759.8ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
16 Mar 175760.0Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
23 Nov 176164.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Mar 177982.0DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-César-Constantin de Rohan-Guémené-Montbazon:
Cardinal Louis-César-Constantin de Rohan-Guémené-Montbazon (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 99
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013